Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 13, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023