House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |