Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Haste
|
|
|