Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB510 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023