Senate | 04/24/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rosino |