Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB536 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023