Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB543 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023