Senate | 04/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Wolfley | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 20 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims, Boles | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Haste |