Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB561 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023