Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB604 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 26, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023