Senate | 05/10/2023 | Request for conference and rejection of HAs rescinded | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | HAs rejected, conference requested | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 21 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin |