Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB645 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023