House | 04/13/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin |