Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB8 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 29, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023