House | 04/10/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bullard |