Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB875 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023