Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Weaver, Howard, Gollihare, Daniels, Woods, Standridge, Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|