Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB899 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023