Senate | 06/06/2023 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Stinson (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Floyd |