Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB97 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 30, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023