House
|
04/22/2024
|
Vetoed 04/22/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe, McEntire, Talley, Swope
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Remove Representative Lawson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Munson
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Lawson
|
|
|