Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1019 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill April 1, 2024
Bill February 25, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024