Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 11 | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Remove Representative Culver as principal House author and substitute with Representative Duel | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Culver |