House
|
05/13/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/13/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner, Stark
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Young (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Goodwin
|
|
|