Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1629 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2024

Amended

Bill March 27, 2024
Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 26, 2024