House
|
05/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Humphrey
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Daniels, Howard, Gollihare, Bullard, Jech, Weaver, Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Schreiber
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Townley
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark, Boatman, Conley, Roberts, Bashore, Lawson, Roe
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|