Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1639 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023