Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Remove Representative Conley as principal House author and substitute with Representative May
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Conley
|
|
|