Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1824 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024