House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Kerbs
|
|
|