Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1859 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Amended

Bill April 22, 2024
Bill March 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 29, 2024