House
|
05/13/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Prieto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Cantrell
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Newton
|
|
|