Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1967 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2024

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2023