Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1987 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023