House
|
05/30/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns, Menz
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Conference granted, SCs named Jett, Howard, Gollihare, Daniels, Jech, Boren
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|