Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2137 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 13, 2023