Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants, Menz, Strom | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Roe |