House
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/03/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Woods
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|