Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2158 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 15, 2023