Senate | 02/05/2024 | Remove as author Senator Montgomery; authored by Senator Paxton | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 9 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick) |