Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2169 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2023