House
|
05/22/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Rural Development Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rural Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|