Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2422 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023