House
|
05/28/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Rogers; authored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 29
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative May
|
|
|