Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2426 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2024