Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Brooks; authored by Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 30; Ayes: 52 Nays: 30
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz, Dollens
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Remove Representative Menz as principal House author and substitute with Representative Blancett
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Menz
|
|
|