Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2724 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill March 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 8, 2024