Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 26; Ayes: 69 Nays: 23
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger, Wolfley, Munson, Ranson, Hefner, Provenzano, Schreiber, Pittman, Deck, Swope, Conley
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Menz
|
|
|