Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2734 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Amended

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2024