House
|
05/26/2023
|
Vetoed 06/09/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Stark
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
HC's named: GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Haste, Rosino, Standridge, Pugh, Pemberton, Hall, Hicks
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Hefner, Dollens
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Rogers
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley, Roe, Cantrell, Manger, Martinez, Pittman, Hill, Boatman, Provenzano, Wallace, Alonso-Sandoval, West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Miller
|
|
|